TX SB804 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to conditions of community supervision for defendants convicted of certain criminal offenses involving animals.
Title
Relating to conditions of community supervision for defendants convicted of certain criminal offenses involving animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-05-14 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Perry |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2012 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Subjects
Animals
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION