TX SB822 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administration of a grant program to support community mental health programs for veterans and their families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration of a grant program to support community mental health programs for veterans and their families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Effective immediately
2019-05-31 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1361
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-09HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2019-04-24HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-13SenateFiled
2019-02-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback