TX SB863 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study of costs associated with dual credit courses offered at public high schools.
Title
Relating to a study of costs associated with dual credit courses offered at public high schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Rep. John Frullo [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3055 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance