TX SB866 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to unconscionable prices charged by certain health care facilities for medical care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unconscionable prices charged by certain health care facilities for medical care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-15SenateFiled
2019-02-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1941 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback