TX SB897 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of salvage vehicle dealers.
Title
Relating to the regulation of salvage vehicle dealers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1667 (Same As) 2019-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SALVAGE YARDS & SALVAGE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SALVAGE YARDS & SALVAGE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB897 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00897I.htm |