TX SB899 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting the sale and purchase of certain aquatic products; creating a criminal offense; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to prohibiting the sale and purchase of certain aquatic products; creating a criminal offense; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1828 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Animals
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing