TX SB9 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to election integrity; increasing criminal penalties; creating criminal offenses; creating civil penalties.
Title
Relating to election integrity; increasing criminal penalties; creating criminal offenses; creating civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Elections |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA14 Menéndez |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA13 Watson |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA12 Campbell |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA11 Powell |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA10 Hall |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA9 Hall |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA8 Bettencourt |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA7 Hall |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA6 Bettencourt |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA5 Menéndez |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Rodríguez |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Rodríguez |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY'S FEES
AUDITS & AUDITORS
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Elections--Voting Systems
FRAUD
SECRETARY OF STATE
AUDITS & AUDITORS
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Elections--Voting Systems
FRAUD
SECRETARY OF STATE