TX SB913 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to consideration of the mental health of public school students in training requirements for certain school employees, curriculum requirements, counseling programs, educational programs, state and regional programs and services, and health care services for students and to mental health first aid program training and reporting regarding local mental health authority and school district personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to consideration of the mental health of public school students in training requirements for certain school employees, curriculum requirements, counseling programs, educational programs, state and regional programs and services, and health care services for students and to mental health first aid program training and reporting regarding local mental health authority and school district personnel.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Education
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-19SenateFiled
2019-02-19SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1069 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to Public Health
HB18 (Similar To) 2019-06-02 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 1, 2019

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback