TX SB919 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of an advanced practice registered nurse or physician assistant to sign a death certificate in limited situations.
Title
Relating to the authority of an advanced practice registered nurse or physician assistant to sign a death certificate in limited situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1751 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BIRTH & DEATH CERTIFICATES
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS