TX SB925 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to calculation of daily production for purposes of the oil and gas production tax credits for low-producing wells and leases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to calculation of daily production for purposes of the oil and gas production tax credits for low-producing wells and leases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-20 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-08 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-08HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-07SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-06SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-06SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 3865
2019-04-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-04-08HouseRead first time
2019-04-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenatePassed
2019-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-20SenateFiled
2019-02-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3865 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback