TX SB926 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-26 - Postponed 5/28/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-26 - Postponed 5/28/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of a public school transportation system in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the operation of a public school transportation system in certain counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-26 | House | Postponed 5/28/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-26 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 10(b) |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-22 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-22 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1258 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3134 |
2019-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3134 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Education
Education--School Districts
SCHOOL BUSES & SCHOOL BUS DRIVERS
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Education--School Districts
SCHOOL BUSES & SCHOOL BUS DRIVERS
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous