TX SB938 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the requirements relating to the adoption of a new state agency rule by the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the requirements relating to the adoption of a new state agency rule by the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1896 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB938 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00938I.htm |