TX SB942 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of money in the state water pollution control revolving fund.
Title
Relating to the use of money in the state water pollution control revolving fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1449 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Recommitted to committee (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Recommitted to committee (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1449 |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Motion withdrawn |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recommitted to committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2023 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Water
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Environment--Water
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General