TX SB957 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voter approval of the issuance of certain obligations by municipalities to pay their unfunded liabilities to a public pension fund.
Title
Relating to voter approval of the issuance of certain obligations by municipalities to pay their unfunded liabilities to a public pension fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-04-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2662 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Municipal
City Government--Finance
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Municipal