TX SB960 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the cancellation of a person's voter registration on notice that the person has acknowledged that the person is not a citizen; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the cancellation of a person's voter registration on notice that the person has acknowledged that the person is not a citizen; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-21SenateFiled
2019-02-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4402 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Elections

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback