TX SB982 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of disaster and emergency services, including health care services, to certain populations.
Title
Relating to the provision of disaster and emergency services, including health care services, to certain populations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2008 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2008 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#2008 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-25 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-25 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1608 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 2-Morrison |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 1-Zerwas |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Governor
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
VOLUNTEERS
Disabilities, Persons with
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Governor
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
VOLUNTEERS