TX SCR1 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Claiming sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the U.S. Constitution over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government by the U.S. Constitution, serving notice to the federal government to halt and reverse certain mandates, and providing that certain federal legislation be prohibited or repealed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Claiming sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the U.S. Constitution over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government by the U.S. Constitution, serving notice to the federal government to halt and reverse certain mandates, and providing that certain federal legislation be prohibited or repealed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-29SenateRecord vote
2019-04-29SenateAdopted
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenateRecord vote
2019-04-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-29SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback