TX SCR10 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing opposition to the enactment or enforcement in Texas of a law that automatically suspends the driver's license of an individual who is convicted of any drug-related offense.
Title
Expressing opposition to the enactment or enforcement in Texas of a law that automatically suspends the driver's license of an individual who is convicted of any drug-related offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR33 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Crimes--Drugs
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses