TX SCR2 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the game wardens of the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department as the "Texas Navy" and commending them for their service to the Lone Star State.
Title
Recognizing the game wardens of the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department as the "Texas Navy" and commending them for their service to the Lone Star State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1380 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1380 |
2019-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR69 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee