TX SCR21 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Approving the settlement agreement between the State of Texas and the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Office for Civil Rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approving the settlement agreement between the State of Texas and the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Office for Civil Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Adopted RV#1254 (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-13SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1254
2019-05-10HouseAdopted
2019-05-10HouseLaid before the House
2019-05-10HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HCR 78
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Resolutions Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateAdopted
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-25SenateFiled
2019-02-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HCR78 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback