TX SCR59 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the president to designate a state funeral for the last surviving Medal of Honor recipient from World War II.
Title
Urging the president to designate a state funeral for the last surviving Medal of Honor recipient from World War II.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Adopted RV#1605 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1605 |
2019-05-22 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-22 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR166 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee