TX SCR64 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the work of the Texas State History Museum Foundation.
Title
Commending the work of the Texas State History Museum Foundation.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |