TX SJR1 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 84-34)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a first responder who is killed or fatally injured in the line of duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a first responder who is killed or fatally injured in the line of duty.

Sponsors

Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Sen. Carlos Uresti [D]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]
Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D]
Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]
Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Gary Elkins [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Larry Gonzales [R]
Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]
Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]
Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]
Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]
Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Joe Pickett [D]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Tomas Uresti [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]
Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - House - SJR 1 Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Passed (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25 Filed with the Secretary of State
2017-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HouseAdopted
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-03-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-13SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-13SenateRecord vote
2017-03-13SenatePassed
2017-03-13SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-13SenateRecord vote
2017-03-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-13SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-13SenateRecord vote
2017-03-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-02-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Finance
2017-01-25SenateRead first time
2016-12-15SenateFiled
2016-12-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SB15 (Enabled by) 2017-05-26 - Sent to the Governor

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback