TX SJR46 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to limit the maximum appraised value of real property for ad valorem tax purposes.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to limit the maximum appraised value of real property for ad valorem tax purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB1086 (Enabled by) 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
HJR47 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
HJR47 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests--Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SJR46 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SJ00046I.htm |