TX SJR69 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment regarding the limitation on the rate of growth of appropriations and the use of surplus state revenue to provide for property tax relief and public school teacher compensation.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment regarding the limitation on the rate of growth of appropriations and the use of surplus state revenue to provide for property tax relief and public school teacher compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR144 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Appropriations
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Salaries & Expenses
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Salaries & Expenses
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SJR69 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SJ00069I.htm |