TX SJR74 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain schools organized and operated primarily for the purpose of engaging in educational functions.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain schools organized and operated primarily for the purpose of engaging in educational functions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR31 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
SB2345 (Enabled by) 2019-05-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar
SB2345 (Enabled by) 2019-05-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions