US HB1014 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses offshore wind development and coral reef conservation. The Department of the Interior may conduct wind and mineral development lease sales on the Outer Continental Shelf in the U.S. Exclusive Economic Zone adjacent to U.S. territories. The bill establishes the Coral Reef Conservation Fund for the Department of Commerce to carry out the Coral Reef Conservation Act of 2000, including to preserve, sustain, and restore the condition of coral reef ecosystems. The bill also specifies requirements for distributing revenues from the leases authorized by this bill to the Treasury, the Coral Reef Conservation Fund, and U.S. territories.
Title
Offshore Wind for Territories Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 182. |
2019-10-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-230. |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB499 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
HB4294 (Related) 2019-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB4294 (Related) 2019-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
American Samoa
Aquatic ecology
Caribbean area
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Guam
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
American Samoa
Aquatic ecology
Caribbean area
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Guam
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands