US HB1016 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 108-22)
Status: Passed on October 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-81.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 108-22)
Status: Passed on October 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-81.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Health Care Budget Reform and Transparency Act of 2009 - Directs the President to include in annual budget justification documents submitted to Congress information on estimates of appropriations for the fiscal year following the fiscal year for which the budget is submitted for the following accounts of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA): (1) Medical Services; (2) Medical Support and Compliance; and (3) Medical Facilities. Requires annually for such accounts, beginning with FY2011, discretionary new budget authority to: (1) be made available for that fiscal year; and (2) include, for each such account, advance discretionary new budget authority that first becomes available for the first fiscal year after the budget year. Directs the VA Secretary to report annually to Congress on the sufficiency of VA resources for the proceeding fiscal year with respect to the provision of medical care, including estimates of the workload and demand data for that fiscal year. Requires the Comptroller General to: (1) annually study the adequacy and accuracy of VA baseline model projections for health care expenditures for that fiscal year; and (2) report study results, during 2011 through 2013, to the congressional veterans, appropriations, and budget committees.
Title
Veterans Health Care Budget Reform and Transparency Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-22 | Became Public Law No: 111-81. | |
2009-10-22 | Signed by President. | |
2009-10-16 | Presented to President. | |
2009-10-14 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-10-13 | Cleared for White House. | |
2009-10-13 | Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10376-10378; text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S10376) | |
2009-10-08 | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment. | |
2009-10-08 | House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment pursuant to H.Res. 804. | |
2009-08-07 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-08-06 | See also S.423. | |
2009-08-06 | Passed Senate in lieu of S. 423 with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text as passed Senate: CR S9059) | |
2009-08-06 | Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 423. | |
2009-08-06 | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9059) | |
2009-07-27 | Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 129. | |
2009-06-24 | Received in the Senate. | |
2009-06-23 | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-23 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-23 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 409 - 1 (Roll no. 420). (text: CR H7094-7095) | |
2009-06-23 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7109-7110) | |
2009-06-23 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Thompson (PA) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-06-23 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1016. | |
2009-06-23 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7094-7097) | |
2009-06-23 | Mr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-06-19 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 87. | |
2009-06-19 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-171. | |
2009-06-10 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2009-06-10 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-06-05 | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. | |
2009-02-13 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HR804 (Related) 2009-10-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB423 (Related) 2009-08-06 - See also H.R. 1016.
SB423 (Related) 2009-08-06 - See also H.R. 1016.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Veterans' medical care