US HB1016 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Biological Implant Tracking and Veteran Safety Act of 2015 Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) adopt the unique device identification system developed for medical devices by the Food and Drug Administration (FDA), or implement a comparable standard identification system, for identifying biological implants intended for use in medical procedures conducted in VA medical facilities; (2) permit a vendor to use any of the accredited entities identified by the FDA as an issuing agency in adopting or implementing such a system; (3) implement a compatible system for tracking the implants from the human donor or animal source to implantation; and (4) implement inventory controls compatible with such tracking system so that all patients who have received, in a VA medical facility, a biological implant subject to a recall by the FDA can be notified of the recall. Sets forth requirements for vendors from which the VA may procure biological implants of human origin, and for vendors from which the VA may procure biological implants of non-human origin, including that such a vendor: uses the standard identification system adopted or implemented by VA under this Act; is registered as required by FDA procedures; consents to periodic inspections and audits by the VA regarding the accuracy of records and the handling of products; agrees to cooperate with all biological implant recalls conducted on the vendor's own initiative, on the initiative of the original product manufacturer used by the vendor, by the request of the FDA, or by a statutory order of the FDA; agrees to notify the VA of any adverse event report it provides to the FDA, or of any warning letter from the FDA issued to the vendor, by not later than 60 days after the vendor receives such report or warning letter; and agrees to retain all records associated with the procurement of a biological implant by the VA for at least five years after the date of the procurement. Requires the VA to: (1) procure such implants under General Services Administration Federal Supply Schedules if they are available under such Schedules, (2) accommodate reasonable vendor requests to undertake specified outreach efforts to educate VA medical professionals about the use and efficacy of implants that are listed on such Schedules, and (3) procure biological implants that are unavailable under such Schedules using competitive procedures in accordance with the Federal Acquisition Regulation. Makes any VA procurement employee found responsible for a biological implant procurement transaction with intent to avoid, or with reckless disregard of, the requirements of this Act ineligible to hold a certificate of appointment as a contracting officer or to serve as the representative of an ordering officer, contracting officer, or purchase card holder.
Title
Biological Implant Tracking and Veteran Safety Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2015-04-21 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2015-03-13 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2334 (Related) 2015-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Business records
Cell biology and embryology
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Product safety and quality
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' medical care
Business records
Cell biology and embryology
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Product safety and quality
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1016/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1016/BILLS-114hr1016ih.pdf |