US HB1023 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No More Excuses Energy Act of 2011 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) allow the issuance of tax-exempt facility bonds for the financing of domestic use oil refinery facilities, (2) extend the tax credit for a facility using wind to produce electricity, (3) set the rate of the excise tax on liquefied natural gas to 24.3 cents per energy equivalent of a gallon of diesel, (4) extend through 2012 the excise tax credit for alternative fuel, (5) allow tax credits for the production of electricity from nuclear energy and the production of fuel from certain onshore wells, and (6) repeal the minimum gas capture requirement for purposes of the carbon dioxide sequestration tax credit. Requires the President to designate at least 10 sites for oil or natural gas refineries on federal lands and make such sites available to the private sector for construction of refineries. Prohibits the Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC) from denying an application for nuclear waste disposal on the grounds of present or future insufficient capacity. American-Made Energy and Good Jobs Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to establish and implement a competitive oil and gas leasing program in the Coastal Plain of Alaska. Repeals the prohibition against producing oil and gas from the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge. Sets forth requirements for the sale of oil and natural gas leases in the Coastal Plain, environmental protection, transportation easements, and royalty payments to Alaska. Establishes in the Treasury the Coastal Plain Local Government Impact Aid Assistance Fund to assist Alaska jurisdictions that are directly impacted by oil and gas exploration and production in the Coastal Plain. Amends the Gulf of Mexico Energy Security Act of 2006 to repeal the moratorium on oil and gas leasing in certain areas in the Gulf of Mexico. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to include the areas removed from such moratorium within the areas available for leasing under the 2007-2012 Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing program. Amends the Clean Air Act to: (1) exclude from the meaning of "air pollutant" carbon dioxide, water vapor, methane, nitrous oxide, hydrofluorocarbons, perfluorocarbons, or sulfur hexafluoride; and (2) declare that nothing in such such Act shall be treated as authorizing or requiring the regulation of climate change or global warming.
Title
No More Excuses Energy Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2011-03-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2011-03-10 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-03-10 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-03-10 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2011-03-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB49 (Related) 2011-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
HB909 (Related) 2011-06-03 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB1292 (Related) 2011-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB1682 (Related) 2011-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB3407 (Related) 2012-02-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 273.
HB909 (Related) 2011-06-03 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB1292 (Related) 2011-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB1682 (Related) 2011-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB3407 (Related) 2012-02-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 273.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Arctic and polar regions
Arctic Ocean
Atlantic Ocean
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Income tax credits
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Pacific Ocean
Pipelines
Radioactive wastes and releases
Sales and excise taxes
Securities
State and local finance
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Air quality
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Arctic and polar regions
Arctic Ocean
Atlantic Ocean
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Income tax credits
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Pacific Ocean
Pipelines
Radioactive wastes and releases
Sales and excise taxes
Securities
State and local finance
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1023/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1023/BILLS-112hr1023ih.pdf |