US HB1049 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 194-28)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 494.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National Heritage Area Act of 2020 This bill establishes a National Heritage Areas System to recognize certain areas of the United States that tell nationally significant stories and to conserve, enhance, and interpret the areas' natural, historic, scenic, and cultural resources that illustrate significant aspects of U.S. heritage, and authorizes appropriations through FY2034 for each National Heritage Area. Through such system, the Department of the Interior may provide technical and financial assistance to local coordinating entities to support the establishment, development, and continuity of such areas. The local coordinating entity of a National Heritage Area, not later than three years after the area is included in the National Heritage Area System, shall submit to Interior a management plan for approval. Interior, not later than one year before the authorization for federal funding expires for a National Heritage Area, shall (1) conduct an evaluation of the accomplishments of that area, and (2) submit a report detailing the evaluation to specified congressional committees. Based upon the evaluation, Interior shall prepare a report with recommendations for the National Park Service's continued role, if any, with respect to the area. Interior may carry out or certify a study to assess the suitability and feasibility of designating a specific geographic area as a National Heritage Area to be included in the National Heritage Area System. The bill (1) spells out the duties and authorities of the local coordinating entities, and (2) sets forth cost-sharing requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Heritage Area Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]
Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 494.
2020-11-19HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-601.
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2020-01-29HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-01-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-30HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback