US HB1058 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
VA Provider Equity Act (Sec. 2) This bill: (1) makes a Veterans Health Administration (VHA) doctor of podiatric medicine eligible for any supervisory position to the same degree as a VHA physician, and (2) increases the pay grade of podiatric surgeons to match the compensation of other VA surgeons, physicians, and dentists. The Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) shall establish standards to ensure that specialists appointed to supervisory VHA positions do not provide direct clinical oversight for purposes of peer review or practice evaluation for providers of other clinical specialties. (Sec. 3) The bill revises the extension date from September 30, 2027, to September 30, 2026, for the $90 per month limit on a VA pension paid to veterans residing in nursing homes when their nursing costs are paid through title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act.
Title
VA Provider Equity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. David Trott [R-MI] | Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-07-24 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6171) |
2017-07-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6198) |
2017-07-24 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Walz objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2017-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1058. |
2017-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6171-6172) |
2017-07-24 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-19 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1871 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5674 (Related) 2018-05-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.
SB2906 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5674 (Related) 2018-05-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.
SB2906 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Veterans' medical care