US HB1058 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 126-47-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Autism CARES Act of 2019 Autism Collaboration, Accountability, Research, Education, and Support Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autism CARES Act of 2019 Autism Collaboration, Accountability, Research, Education, and Support Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]
Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-25SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-07-24HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-24HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7303-7304)
2019-07-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1058.
2019-07-24HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7303-7308)
2019-07-24HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-07-23HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 137.
2019-07-23HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-177.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-11HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-07-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-25HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB427 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback