US HB1060 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows nonprofit organizations offering mortgage loans for charitable purposes to use certain alternative forms to satisfy disclosure requirements.
Title
BUILD Act Building Up Independent Lives and Dreams Act
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3767) |
2019-05-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1060. |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3767-3769) |
2019-05-14 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB371 (Same As) 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-342.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Housing finance and home ownership
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Housing finance and home ownership
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations