US HB1088 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Society of the First Infantry Division to modify the First Division Monument located on federal land in President's Park, District of Columbia, to honor members of the First Infantry Division of the U.S. Army who died during U.S. operations, including Operation Desert Storm, Operation Iraqi Freedom, Operation New Dawn, and Operation Enduring Freedom. The First Infantry Division must provide the society with a list of names to be added to the monument. The Commemorative Works Act, which prohibits monuments to military units, shall not apply to this authorization. Federal funds may not be used to pay the society for the modification.
Title
FIRST Act First Infantry Recognition of Sacrifice in Theater Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2019-11-20 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9084-9085) |
2019-11-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1088. |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9084-9086) |
2019-11-20 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 220. |
2019-11-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-275. |
2019-06-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-19 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB389 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 348.
Subjects
Afghanistan
Asia
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Iraq
Kuwait
Middle East
Military history
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Asia
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Iraq
Kuwait
Middle East
Military history
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Veterans' organizations and recognition