US HB1094 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Defense to award three-year competitive grants to state and local educational agencies for the establishment, improvement, or expansion of world language (e.g., foreign language or American Sign Language) programs in elementary and secondary schools.
Title
World Language Advancement and Readiness Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] |
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB2307 (Related) 2019-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB2307 (Related) 2019-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1094/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1094/BILLS-116hr1094ih.pdf |