US HB1109 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 131-4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mental Health Services for Students Act of 2019 This bill provides specific statutory authority for the Project AWARE (Advancing Wellness and Resiliency in Education) State Educational Agency Grant Program that is administered by the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration. The program supports school-based mental health services, including screening, treatment, and outreach programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Services for Students Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-09HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-09-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-06-30HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1122 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5469 (Related) 2020-09-09 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback