US HB1112 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises background check requirements applicable to proposed firearm transfers from a federal firearms licensee (e.g., a licensed gun dealer) to an unlicensed person. Additionally, the bill modifies statutory references with respect to a particular category of prohibited persons (i.e., persons barred from receiving or possessing a firearm). Specifically, it replaces references to persons "adjudicated as a mental defective" with persons "adjudicated with mental illness, severe developmental disability, or severe emotional instability."
Title
Enhanced Background Checks Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - On passage RC# 103 (Y: 228 N: 198 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 102 (Y: 194 N: 232 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - On agreeing to the Van Drew amendment (A005) H.Amdt.53 RC# 101 (Y: 234 N: 193 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - On agreeing to the Schneider amendment (A002) H.Amdt.50 RC# 100 (Y: 282 N: 144 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 102 (Y: 194 N: 232 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - On agreeing to the Van Drew amendment (A005) H.Amdt.53 RC# 101 (Y: 234 N: 193 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - On agreeing to the Schneider amendment (A002) H.Amdt.50 RC# 100 (Y: 282 N: 144 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-02-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-02-28 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 198 (Roll no. 103). (text: CR H2284) |
2019-02-28 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 194 - 232 (Roll no. 102). |
2019-02-28 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2019-02-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lesko motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to insert new text on cases in which the transferee is a victim of a crime of domestic violence. |
2019-02-28 | House | Mrs. Lesko moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H2291) |
2019-02-28 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-02-28 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1112. |
2019-02-28 | House | H.Amdt.53 On agreeing to the Van Drew amendment (A005) Agreed to by recorded vote: 234 - 193 (Roll no. 101). |
2019-02-28 | House | H.Amdt.50 On agreeing to the Schneider amendment (A002) Agreed to by recorded vote: 282 - 144 (Roll no. 100). |
2019-02-28 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Van Drew amendment No. 5, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Collins (GA) demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day. |
2019-02-28 | House | DEABTE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Van Drew amendment No. 5. |
2019-02-28 | House | H.Amdt.53 Amendment (A005) offered by Mr. Van Drew. (consideration: CR H2288-2289, H2290-2291; text: CR H2288) |
2019-02-28 | House | H.Amdt.52 On agreeing to the Porter amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-02-28 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Porter amendment No. 4. |
2019-02-28 | House | H.Amdt.52 Amendment (A004) offered by Ms. Porter. (consideration: CR H2287-2288; text: CR H2288) |
2019-02-28 | House | H.Amdt.51 On agreeing to the Levin (MI) amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-02-28 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Levin (MI) amendment No. 3. |
2019-02-28 | House | H.Amdt.51 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Levin (MI). (consideration: CR H2287; text: CR H2287) |
2019-02-28 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Schneider amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Nadler demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day. |
2019-02-28 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Schneider amendment No. 2. |
2019-02-28 | House | H.Amdt.50 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Schneider. (consideration: CR H2285-2287, H2289-2290; text: CR H2285) |
2019-02-28 | House | H.Amdt.49 By unanimous consent, the Rice (SC) amendment was withdrawn. (consideration: CR H2285) |
2019-02-28 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 145, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rice (SC) amendment No. 1. |
2019-02-28 | House | H.Amdt.49 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Rice (SC). (consideration: CR H2284-2285; text: CR H2285) |
2019-02-28 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1112. |
2019-02-28 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Lauren Underwood to act as Chairwoman of the Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 145 and Rule XVIII. |
2019-02-28 | House | Provides for one hour of debate on each measure. Only those amendments printed in the report shall be in order and the previous question shall be considered ordered without intervening motions except one motion to recommit with or without instructions. |
2019-02-28 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 145. (consideration: CR H2277-2293) |
2019-02-26 | House | Rule H. Res. 145 passed House. |
2019-02-25 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 145 Reported to House. Provides for one hour of debate on each measure. Only those amendments printed in the report shall be in order and the previous question shall be considered ordered without intervening motions except one motion to recommit with or without instructions. |
2019-02-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 4. |
2019-02-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-12. |
2019-02-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14. |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR145 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Retail and wholesale trades
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Retail and wholesale trades