US HB113 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits agencies from using funds to procure a U.S. flag unless such flag has been manufactured in the United States from materials that have been U.S. grown, produced, or manufactured. The bill specifies exceptions to this prohibition, including an exception if flags of satisfactory quality and sufficient quantity cannot be procured as needed at market prices.
Title
All-American Flag Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-01-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H566) |
2019-01-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 113. |
2019-01-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H566-567) |
2019-01-15 | House | Mr. Cummings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1963 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Buy American requirements
Government operations and politics
National symbols
Public contracts and procurement
Government operations and politics
National symbols
Public contracts and procurement