US HB1135 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes advance appropriations for the Indian Health Services and Indian Health Facilities accounts of the Indian Health Service. The advance appropriations provide new budget authority that first becomes available in the first fiscal year after the budget year. The bill requires the President's budget request to include information on estimates for the advance appropriations.
Title
Indian Health Service Advance Appropriations Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2541 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Native Americans
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Native Americans
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1135/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1135/BILLS-116hr1135ih.pdf |