US HB1159 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encourages the use of innovative construction materials and techniques to accelerate the deployment, extend the service life, improve the performance, and reduce the cost of domestic transportation and water infrastructure projects. Among other things, the bill establishes an Interagency Innovative Materials Standards Task Force to assess existing standards and test methods for the use of innovative materials in infrastructure, identify key barriers in the standards area that inhibit broader market adoption, and develop new methods and protocols, as necessary, to better evaluate innovative materials; requires the Department of Transportation to enhance the development of innovative materials in the United States by providing awards to entities for establishing and operating new innovative material innovation hubs; directs the Federal Highway Administration to provide grants to states departments of transportation, tribal governments, or units of local governments for coastal and rural infrastructure bridge projects; and provides grants for the design and installation of water infrastructure projects.
Title
IMAGINE Act Innovative Materials for America's Growth and Infrastructure Newly Expanded Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB403 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB6898 (Related) 2020-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB6898 (Related) 2020-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Materials
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Materials
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1159/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1159/BILLS-116hr1159ih.pdf |