US HB1168 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses workforce development by advancing science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM) education, revising and implementing certain worker training, retention, and advancement programs, establishing the Distressed Community Investment Agency, and renaming the Department of Commerce as the Department of Innovation and Investment. The bill requires (1) the Department of Education (ED) to award grants to eligible entities to implement certain formal and informal engineering education programs in elementary and secondary schools, and (2) the use of certain career and technical education program funds for supporting a hands-on learning approach. The bill establishes in the Department of Labor an Office of Apprenticeship, including a National Advisory Committee on Apprenticeships, to promote apprenticeship programs. Labor and ED must establish a voluntary Registered Apprenticeship-College Collaborative consisting of the sponsors carrying out registered apprenticeship programs, two- or four-year post secondary educational institutions, and organizations that represent such programs or institutions. The bill requires states to provide a Labor-approved reemployment bonus program for individuals currently receiving unemployment benefits. It also allows states to use workforce development funds for a wage insurance program for individuals age 50 and over (age 45 and over for individuals in economically distressed communities) and establishes a training voucher program to assist workers in obtaining job skills training.
Title
WORKER Act Working On Rewarding and Keeping Employees Resilient Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4965 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB3245 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3245 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Building construction
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Labor and employment
Performance measurement
Vocational and technical education
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Labor and employment
Performance measurement
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1168/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1168/BILLS-116hr1168ih.pdf |