US HB1182 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Strategic Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Strategic Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Intermediate-Range Nuclear Forces (INF) Treaty Preservation Act of 2017 This bill states U.S. policy that: (1) Russian actions in violation of the the Treaty between the United States of America and the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics on the Elimination of their Intermediate-Range and Shorter-Range Missiles (INF treaty) constitute a material breach, (2) the United States is legally entitled to suspend the treaty, and (3) the United States should take certain actions to bring Russia into compliance. The bill authorizes additional appropriations for: (1) development of active defenses to counter ground launched missile systems, (2) counterforce and countervailing capabilities, and (3) missile system transfers to allied countries. The Department of Defense shall: (1) establish a program to develop a dual-capable road-mobile ground-launched cruise missile system with a range of 500 to 5,500 kilometers; (2) report on the feasibility of modifying the tomahawk, standard missile-3, standard missile-6, long-range stand off cruise missile, and Army tactical missile for ground-launch with such range; and (3) report on the AEGIS Ashore sites with anti-air warfare capability necessary in Asia and Europe to defend U.S. forces and allies from Russian ground launched missile systems. The Director of National Intelligence, every 90 days for five years, shall determine whether Russia has flight tested, produced, or possesses a system that is inconsistent with the treaty and that has reached initial operational capability and is, or is about to be, deployed. No funds may be obligated or expended to extend the New START Treaty after 2021, permit Russian flights over the United States or U.S. allies pursuant to the Open Skies Treaty, permit the approval of new implementation decisions through the Open Skies Consultative Commission, or approve any license to export an item or technology to a Russian person or entity unless the President certifies that Russia has eliminated all missiles that are in violation of, or inconsistent with, the INF treaty. The Department of State shall conduct a review of Russia's RS-26 ballistic missile system. Upon a determination that Russia has flight-tested, produced, or is in possession of certain missiles, the President shall suspend the application of the INF treaty to the United States and notify the other state parties to the treaty of Russia's material breach of, and the U.S. decision to suspend, the treaty.
Title
Intermediate-Range Nuclear Forces (INF) Treaty Preservation Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB430 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alliances
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Europe
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
International law and treaties
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Nuclear weapons
Russia
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Europe
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
International law and treaties
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Nuclear weapons
Russia