US HB1185 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 219-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Paid Family and Medical Leave within the Social Security Administration. The bill entitles every individual to a family and medical leave insurance (FMLI) benefit payment for a specified benefit period and prescribes a formula for determining the individual's monthly benefit amount, An FMLI benefit payment shall be coordinated with any periodic benefits received under a state or local temporary disability insurance or family leave program. The bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to impose a tax on employers, employees, and self-employed individuals to fund FMLI benefits. It also establishes the Federal Family and Medical Leave Insurance Trust Fund to hold tax revenues.
Title
FAMILY Act Family and Medical Insurance Leave Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB463 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3513 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6442 (Related) 2020-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3513 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6442 (Related) 2020-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adult day care
Advisory bodies
Child care and development
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Disability assistance
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Employment taxes
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Labor and employment
Railroads
Social Security Administration
Social security and elderly assistance
Transportation employees
Wages and earnings
Adult day care
Advisory bodies
Child care and development
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Disability assistance
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Employment taxes
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Labor and employment
Railroads
Social Security Administration
Social security and elderly assistance
Transportation employees
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1185/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1185/BILLS-116hr1185ih.pdf |