US HB1186 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALTS Act Synthetic Abuse and Labeling of Toxic Substances Act of 2015 Amends the Controlled Substances Act to authorize the following factors to be considered in determining whether a controlled substance analogue was intended for human consumption: the marketing, advertising, and labeling of the substance; the known efficacy or usefulness of the substance for the marketed, advertised, or labeled purpose; the difference between the price at which the substance is sold and the price at which the substance it is purported to be or advertised as is normally sold; the diversion of the substance from legitimate channels and the clandestine importation, manufacture, or distribution of the substance; whether the defendant knew or should have known that the substance was intended to be consumed by injection, inhalation, ingestion, or any other immediate means; and whether the substance is manufactured, formulated, sold, distributed, or marketed with the intent to avoid the provisions of existing drug laws. Declares that evidence that a substance was not marketed, advertised, or labeled for human consumption shall not by itself be sufficient to establish that the substance was not intended for human consumption.
Title
SALTS Act Synthetic Abuse and Labeling of Toxic Substances Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1327 (Related) 2015-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Evidence and witnesses
Marketing and advertising
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Evidence and witnesses
Marketing and advertising
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1186/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1186/BILLS-114hr1186ih.pdf |