US HB1196 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an increased work opportunity tax credit for employers who hire veterans who have been certified as discharged or released from active duty in the Armed Forces after September 11, 2001, and who begin working for the employer after December 31, 2019, and before January 1, 2024. This increased credit is in addition to any work opportunity tax credit allowed to a veteran with a service-connected disability.
Title
Jobs for Veterans Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1196/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1196/BILLS-116hr1196ih.pdf |