US HB1199 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to report to Congress regarding the accessibility of VA websites (including attached files and web-based applications) to individuals with disabilities. The report shall identify websites, files, and applications that are not accessible to such individuals and include the VA's plan to make each of them accessible.
Title
VA Website Accessibility Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-10-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8131) |
2019-10-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1199. |
2019-10-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8130-8132) |
2019-10-15 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-06-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 93. |
2019-06-25 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-127. |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB746 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation