US HB1220 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the Adams Memorial Commission to carry out the provisions of Public Law 107-62, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Act that authorized the Adams Memorial Foundation to establish a commemorative work in Washington, DC, to honor John Adams and his legacy to, instead, establish the Adams Memorial Commission to establish a permanent memorial in DC for such purpose. The commission shall: (1) consider, formulate, and report plans for such memorial; and (2) terminate seven years after this bill's enactment.
Title
To establish the Adams Memorial Commission to carry out the provisions of Public Law 107-62, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6623) |
2018-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1220. |
2018-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6623-6624) |
2018-07-23 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-02-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 427. |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-566. |
2018-01-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-01-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-10 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
District of Columbia
Government operations and politics
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
U.S. history
Government operations and politics
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
U.S. history