US HB1222 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Became Public Law No: 116-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act This bill allows a state to use federal funds to cover a higher percentage of the costs for the construction and expansion of public target ranges. Specifically, a state may use specified federal grant funds to pay up to 90% of such costs (rather than 75%, as under current law). Additionally, amounts provided for these purposes shall remain available for five fiscal years (rather than two, as under current law).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-17.
2019-05-10SenateSigned by President.
2019-05-02SenatePresented to President.
2019-04-30SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2502)
2019-04-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-29HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3288-3289)
2019-04-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1222.
2019-04-29HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3288-3290)
2019-04-29HouseMr. Van Drew moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB94 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback