US HB1223 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the requirements for determining the unrelated business taxable income of tax-exempt organizations. The bill repeals a provision that requires unrelated business taxable income to be increased by the amount of expenses paid or incurred by a tax-exempt organization for certain fringe benefits for which a tax deduction is not allowed, including benefits relating to transportation, parking, or an on-premises athletic facility. The bill also increases the corporate income tax rate from 21% to 21.03%.
Title
Stop the Tax Hike on Charities and Places of Worship Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB501 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB513 (Related) 2019-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB632 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1545 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB513 (Related) 2019-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB632 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1545 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Business expenses
Corporate finance and management
Income tax rates
Sports and recreation facilities
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Transportation costs
Corporate finance and management
Income tax rates
Sports and recreation facilities
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1223/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1223/BILLS-116hr1223ih.pdf |